MN SF917 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy benefit manager business practices modification and general reimbursement practices establishment; maximum allowable cost pricing requirements modification
Title
Pharmacy benefit manager business practices modification and general reimbursement practices establishment; maximum allowable cost pricing requirements modification
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Wiklund |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Author added Tomassoni |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1279 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Author added Elkins