MN SF904 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Authors added Hoffman; Kiffmeyer
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Authors added Hoffman; Kiffmeyer
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human services commissioner requirement to seek an amendment to the brain injury waiver establishment; traumatic brain injury definition modification for the state traumatic brain injury program authorization
Title
Human services commissioner requirement to seek an amendment to the brain injury waiver establishment; traumatic brain injury definition modification for the state traumatic brain injury program authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Authors added Hoffman; Kiffmeyer |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF659 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Author added Hollins