MN SF902 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal and traffic surcharge reduction or waiver in certain instances authorization; courts consideration of indigency or hardship before imposing certain fines, fees, or surcharges requirement
Title
Criminal and traffic surcharge reduction or waiver in certain instances authorization; courts consideration of indigency or hardship before imposing certain fines, fees, or surcharges requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Author added Koran |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF306 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - Authors added Freiberg and Bernardy