MN SF878 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Carlson
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Carlson
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution memorializing Congress to overturn the Supreme Court decision Citizens United v. FEC; requesting that Congress clarify that the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment; asking that Congress propose a constitutional amendment to provide such a clarification
Title
A resolution memorializing Congress to overturn the Supreme Court decision Citizens United v. FEC; requesting that Congress clarify that the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment; asking that Congress propose a constitutional amendment to provide such a clarification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Author added Carlson |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |