MN SF843 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Murphy
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota African American Family Preservation Act; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota African American Family Preservation Act; appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateAuthor added Murphy
2021-03-08SenateAuthor added Klein
2021-02-18SenateAuthor added Fateh
2021-02-11SenateReferred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
2021-02-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1151 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Author added Keeler

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback