MN SF843 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription monitoring program prescriber's authority to prescribe controlled substances restrictions
Title
Prescription monitoring program prescriber's authority to prescribe controlled substances restrictions
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Author stricken Schoen |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1219 (Similar To) 2017-02-20 - Author added Clark.