MN SF842 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Trapping on certain private lands without written permission prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trapping on certain private lands without written permission prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateAuthor added Marty
2019-02-07SenateAuthor stricken Rosen
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
2019-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF880 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Author added Fischer

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback