MN SF831 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drug manufacturer importation pathway plan application and incentives
Title
Prescription drug manufacturer importation pathway plan application and incentives
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
Sen. Julia Coleman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Author added Coleman |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2004 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy