MN SF821 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF837
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State road construction appropriation modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State road construction appropriation modification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateRule 45; subst. General Orders HF837
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading
2017-03-28SenateComm report: To pass
2017-03-06SenateAuthor added Frentz
2017-02-23SenateAuthors added Kiffmeyer; Dibble
2017-02-22SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2017-02-09SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF837 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 14 04/03/17

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback