MN SF82 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Penalties for certain assaults on peace officers, judges, prosecuting attorneys and correctional employees increase; mandatory minimum sentences establishment
Title
Penalties for certain assaults on peace officers, judges, prosecuting attorneys and correctional employees increase; mandatory minimum sentences establishment
Sponsors
Sen. John Jasinski [R] | Sen. Gene Dornink [R] | Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Author added Rosen |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Author stricken Tomassoni |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF185 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Author added Erickson