MN SF817 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Anderson, P.
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Anderson, P.
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National sports center sales tax collections, amateur sports account establishment and dedication
Title
National sports center sales tax collections, amateur sports account establishment and dedication
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Author added Anderson, P. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Author added Senjem |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1295 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Author added West