MN SF811 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Hall
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hearing aids health insurance coverage requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hearing aids health insurance coverage requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateAuthor added Hall
2019-02-11SenateAuthor added Dziedzic
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF486 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback