MN SF8 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Assisted living licensing requirements, fees, and fines establishment; health and home care bills of rights modifications; home care licensing, office of health facility complaints powers, vulnerable adults act, and consumer protection modifications; task forces establishment; appropriations
Title
Assisted living licensing requirements, fees, and fines establishment; health and home care bills of rights modifications; home care licensing, office of health facility complaints powers, vulnerable adults act, and consumer protection modifications; task forces establishment; appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authors added Relph; Ruud; Abeler; Eken |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Family Care and Aging |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF90 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 60