MN SF793 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms safety, archery, hunting and angling inclusion in school physical education courses grant program establishment and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms safety, archery, hunting and angling inclusion in school physical education courses grant program establishment and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Finance and Policy
2019-02-14SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
2019-02-04SenateReferred to E-12 Finance and Policy
2019-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1877 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Author added Robbins

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback