MN SF768 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF622
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF622
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Real estate brokers and licensees advertising requirements modifications
Title
Real estate brokers and licensees advertising requirements modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF622 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Author added Sparks |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF622 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/17/2019