MN SF759 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental nutrition assistance gross income limit modification
Title
Supplemental nutrition assistance gross income limit modification
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] |
Sen. Jen McEwen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF611 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Author added Morrison