MN SF740 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Klein
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Klein
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Claims from hospitals and ambulance services disallowance
Title
Claims from hospitals and ambulance services disallowance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF363 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Author added Boldon