MN SF73 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis provisions modification
Title
Cannabis provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Port [D] | Sen. Clare Oumou Verbeten [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] |
Sen. Liz Boldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: Amended, No recommendation, re-referred to Rules and Administration |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended Labor |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Development |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Comm report: Amended, No recommendation, re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF100 (Similar To) 2023-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 63