MN SF694 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota premium security plan administration by the Minnesota Comprehensive Health Association requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota premium security plan administration by the Minnesota Comprehensive Health Association requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy
2021-03-01HouseReceived from Senate
2021-03-01SenateThird reading Passed
2021-03-01SenateSpecial Order
2021-02-18SenateAuthor added Abeler
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading
2021-02-18SenateComm report: To pass
2021-02-17SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2021-02-17SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2021-02-08SenateAuthors added Benson; Dornink; Rosen
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2021-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1153 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Author added Gruenhagen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback