MN SF684 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco use prevention and cessation activities appropriation
Title
Tobacco use prevention and cessation activities appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Author added Ingebrigtsen |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF569 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Author added Mariani