MN SF659 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Manufactured home installers internet continuing education approval specification
Title
Manufactured home installers internet continuing education approval specification
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-04-16 | Governor approval | |
2021-04-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 11 | |
2021-04-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-04-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned from House |
2021-04-12 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third reading |
2021-04-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 12, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-03-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF682 |
2021-03-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF682 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Author added Mekeland