MN SF649 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Author added Port
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Author added Port
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution memorializing Congress to overturn the United States Supreme Court decision Citizens United v. FEC; requesting Congress to clarify rights protected under Constitution are rights of natural persons and not rights of artificial entities and spending money to influence elections is not speech under First Amendment; asking Congress to propose constitutional amendment
Title
Resolution memorializing Congress to overturn the United States Supreme Court decision Citizens United v. FEC; requesting Congress to clarify rights protected under Constitution are rights of natural persons and not rights of artificial entities and spending money to influence elections is not speech under First Amendment; asking Congress to propose constitutional amendment
Sponsors
Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
Sen. Lindsey Port [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Author added Port |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Authors added Dziedzic; Rest; Putnam |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF868 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Authors added Lee, Noor