MN SF646 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Red Wing Eisenhower Memorial Bridge over Mississippi River Bridge of Valor rename authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Red Wing Eisenhower Memorial Bridge over Mississippi River Bridge of Valor rename authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseSecond reading
2019-05-01HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-04-30HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF548
2019-04-30HouseReceived from Senate
2019-04-29SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-29SenateSpecial Order
2019-03-11SenateSecond reading
2019-03-11SenateComm report: To pass
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-01-31SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF548 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback