MN SF637 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Correctional Facility St. Cloud, Mahnomen water infrastructure and Oronoco Regional Wastewater System prior appropriations modification
Title
Minnesota Correctional Facility St. Cloud, Mahnomen water infrastructure and Oronoco Regional Wastewater System prior appropriations modification
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Authors added Senjem; Pappas; Putnam; Utke |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF506 (Similar To) 2021-05-15 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 17, 2021