MN SF611 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Anoka county waste disposal engineering closed landfill site and closed landfill investment fund appropriations
Title
Anoka county waste disposal engineering closed landfill site and closed landfill investment fund appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF657 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division