MN SF584 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 8 04/11/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 8 04/11/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allied health professions conversion to a birth month renewal cycle authorization
Title
Allied health professions conversion to a birth month renewal cycle authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 8 04/11/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Governor's action Approval 04/11/2019 | |
2019-04-11 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-04-11 | Governor approval | |
2019-04-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned from House |
2019-04-04 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading |
2019-04-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 4, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF636 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Author added Bahner