MN SF583 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF637
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF637
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Temporary license suspensions and background checks for certain health-related professions modification
Title
Temporary license suspensions and background checks for certain health-related professions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF637 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF637 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 49