MN SF582 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bioincentive program modification and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bioincentive program modification and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy
2021-02-25SenateComm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy
2021-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF804 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback