MN SF58 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disabled veteran's homestead market value exclusion administration data sharing permission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disabled veteran's homestead market value exclusion administration data sharing permission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes
2019-01-22SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
2019-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF203 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback