MN SF566 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Spreading manure restrictions repeal and future restrictions prohibition
Title
Spreading manure restrictions repeal and future restrictions prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1296 (Similar To) 2021-03-23 - Author added Nelson, N.