MN SF557 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Newman
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cooperative private divorce program establishment and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cooperative private divorce program establishment and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateAuthor added Newman
2019-03-18SenateChief author added Hall
2019-03-18SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Pappas
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-01-28SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1115 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Author added McDonald

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback