MN SF519 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Offenders released from incarceration identification cards; commissioner of corrections requirements to provide information, services, medications, a homelessness mitigation plan, and reporting
Title
Offenders released from incarceration identification cards; commissioner of corrections requirements to provide information, services, medications, a homelessness mitigation plan, and reporting
Sponsors
Sen. David Osmek [R] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] |
Sen. John Marty [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House: Passage, as amended by Conference (Y: 124 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 24 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Returned from House |
2021-05-17 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-05-17 | House | Third reading |
2021-05-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | House | Second reading |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2021-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Authors added Rarick; Limmer; Marty |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Author added Dibble |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF553 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Author added Hertaus