MN SF4912 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota submission of information to legislature prior to the introduction of a bill appropriating money requirement provision, requiring annual reporting, health professions workforce advisory council recommendations from the commissioner of health requirement, and University of Minnesota academic health system appropriation
Title
Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota submission of information to legislature prior to the introduction of a bill appropriating money requirement provision, requiring annual reporting, health professions workforce advisory council recommendations from the commissioner of health requirement, and University of Minnesota academic health system appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Higher Education |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Author added Mann |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4859 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy