MN SF4762 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Fateh
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Fateh
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Immigrant Development Center appropriation
Title
Immigrant Development Center appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Author added Hawj |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Author added Oumou Verbeten |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Development |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4832 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Authors added Pérez-Vega and Noor