MN SF458 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed veterans organizations use of gross profits from lawful gambling for repair, maintenance, or improvement of real property authorization
Title
Licensed veterans organizations use of gross profits from lawful gambling for repair, maintenance, or improvement of real property authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] |
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authors added Housley; Anderson; Kiffmeyer |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF564 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Author added Boe