MN SF4552 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Authors added Chamberlain; Draheim
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Authors added Chamberlain; Draheim
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitality industry reimbursement for losses from perishable products appropriation
Title
Hospitality industry reimbursement for losses from perishable products appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Authors added Chamberlain; Draheim |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Author added Anderson, P. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4621 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Author added Jordan