MN SF4519 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Peacetime emergency declaration declared by governor legislative approval to extend duration requirement
Title
Peacetime emergency declaration declared by governor legislative approval to extend duration requirement
Sponsors
Sen. David Osmek [R] | Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Authors added Westrom; Jasinski; Koran; Kiffmeyer |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4592 (Similar To) 2020-05-14 - Author added Robbins