MN SF4345 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4030
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4030
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bullion coins and bullion products dealers provisions modifications
Title
Bullion coins and bullion products dealers provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4030 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4030 (Similar To) 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 75