MN SF4212 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conditions amendment for participation in an open meeting from a non public location
Title
Conditions amendment for participation in an open meeting from a non public location
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-04-04 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Local Government Policy |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4441 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Second reading