MN SF419 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Refundable film production individual income tax credit
Title
Refundable film production individual income tax credit
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF961 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Author added Davnie