MN SF417 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - HF substituted in committee HF58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joseph Gomm memorial highway designation for trunk highway #95 in West Lakeland township, Bayport and Oak Park Heights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joseph Gomm memorial highway designation for trunk highway #95 in West Lakeland township, Bayport and Oak Park Heights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateHF substituted in committee HF58
2019-01-31SenateAuthor added Bigham
2019-01-28SenateAuthor added Newton
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-01-24SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF58 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 15 05/03/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback