MN SF4146 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SNAP step up for seniors program establishment and appropriation
Title
SNAP step up for seniors program establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Author added Maye Quade |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Author added Kunesh |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4108 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Author added Lee, F.