MN SF4131 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment providing for the renewal of the environment and natural resources trust fund
Title
Constitutional amendment providing for the renewal of the environment and natural resources trust fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Finance |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03 Suspended amend previous committee report |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4649 (Similar To) 2022-05-20 - Second reading