MN SF4115 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax abatement for land bank property authorization
Title
Property tax abatement for land bank property authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] |
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Author added Weber |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Author added Dibble |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4265 (Similar To) 2024-03-01 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division