MN SF406 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Right establishment for a pregnant patient to have a designated support person present while receiving health care
Title
Right establishment for a pregnant patient to have a designated support person present while receiving health care
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Julia Coleman [R] |
Sen. Liz Boldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF52 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Author added Her