MN SF4010 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contractors construction materials sales and use tax exemption provisions modifications
Title
Contractors construction materials sales and use tax exemption provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3819 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes