MN SF3993 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grant authorization and appropriation to create urgency rooms for mental health emergencies
Title
Grant authorization and appropriation to create urgency rooms for mental health emergencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4372 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy