MN SF3962 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Authors added Westrom; Weber
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State building code exemptions from inspections clarification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State building code exemptions from inspections clarification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateAuthors added Westrom; Weber
2020-03-12SenateAuthor added Utke
2020-03-09SenateAuthor added Goggin
2020-03-04SenateReferred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
2020-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF4249 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Author added Bierman

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback