MN SF3928 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4165
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4165
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Divestment from certain investments relating to Russia and Belarus requirement; contracts with Russian and Belarusian entities termination
Title
Divestment from certain investments relating to Russia and Belarus requirement; contracts with Russian and Belarusian entities termination
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
Sen. Julia Coleman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4165 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4165 (Similar To) 2022-04-01 - Secretary of State Chapter 43