MN SF3837 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment allocating state general sales tax revenues related to rental vehicles, motor vehicle repair and replacement parts, and leased vehicles exclusively to fund roads and for transportation purposes; road and bridge and trunk highway construction funds creation
Title
Constitutional amendment allocating state general sales tax revenues related to rental vehicles, motor vehicle repair and replacement parts, and leased vehicles exclusively to fund roads and for transportation purposes; road and bridge and trunk highway construction funds creation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report Joint rule 2.03 suspended and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4437 (Similar To) 2018-05-18 - Authors added O'Driscoll, Anselmo, and West.